Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ryan Allen Vanostrand, Vanostrand, Ryan Allen, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with McFadden, Linda A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Third-Strike Filing | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.