Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Adrian Angel Luna, Luna, Adrian Angel, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Cordova, Ricardo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Rhynes, Gloria F. |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.