Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Nicholas Alex Richers, Richers, Nicholas Alex, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeo, Nancy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Search Order | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.