Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Allison Danielle Bentley, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Valli K. Israels presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.