Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jorge Meza Serrano, Serrano, Jorge Meza, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Valli K. Israels presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValli K. Israels Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.