Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cristian Padilla, Padilla, Cristian, represented by Villalobos, Aaron, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Cordova, Ricardo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Personal Appearance | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.