Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ivan Francisco Mendoza, Mendoza, Ivan Francisco, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with McFadden, Linda A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Filing | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.