Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gustavo Rodriguez, Rodriguez, Gustavo, Jr, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with McFadden, Linda A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Personal Appearance | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance with Counsel | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.