Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Chantal Renee Turner, Turner, Chantal Renee, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Zeff, Thomas D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2010 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Cash Bail Posted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.