Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ryan Christopher Attaway, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeo, Nancy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.