Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Pc1368: Mental Competency case against Collins, Norman Clayton, Iii, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with McFadden, Linda A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2019 |
CategoryPc1368: Mental Competency |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
1372 Certification of Mental Competency Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
1372 Certification of Mental Competency Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Return on 1372 | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | 1372 Report | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Mental Status Report | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.