Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Reichert, Stanford E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person (Limited) |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 | Hearing | Conservatorship Investigator Review Re: Annual Comment CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI ANNUAL REVIEW DUE | |
May 03, 2022 | Hearing | Conservatorship Compliance Review Hearing Judicial Officer Reichert, Stanford E Hearing Time 10:00 AM | |
February 15, 2022 | Hearing | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Comment copy of minute order | |
February 15, 2022 | Hearing | Conservatorship Compliance Review Hearing Judicial Officer Reichert, Stanford E Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held | |
September 27, 2021 | Hearing | Claim Fwd to Fin & Adm Off/Indigent Defense for Payment Comment in the amount of $981.50 | |
August 03, 2021 | Hearing | Claim Received, Verified and Forwarded to Dept Comment S35 | |
July 29, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Conservatee's Rights Filed | |
July 29, 2021 | Hearing | Determination of Conservatee's Appropriate Level of Care | |
July 26, 2021 | Hearing | Court Appointed Attorney Claim Received Comment from Emily Lerner in the amount of $981.50 for 02/23/21 to 07/20/201 | |
July 20, 2021 | Hearing | Order Signed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.