Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Alejandra Valenzuela filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Hearing | HEARING ON CIVIL HARASSMENT FILED BY ALEJANDRA VALENZUELA. | |
November 26, 2018 | Document_Filed | DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE FILED | |
November 21, 2018 | Document_Filed | PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CATHERINEANN SALDIVAR WITH COSTS OF $40.00 | |
November 07, 2018 | Document_Filed | STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED | |
November 07, 2018 | Document_Filed | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER-CIVIL HARASSMENT - FILED. | |
November 07, 2018 | Document_Filed | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING - CIVIL HARASSMENT - FILED | |
November 07, 2018 | Action | RESTRAINING ORDERS ENTERED INTO CLETS. | |
November 07, 2018 | Action | DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE NOTICED OF ORDER VIA CLETS ENTRY | |
November 07, 2018 | Action | EX PARTE HEARING RE: HARASSMENT | |
November 05, 2018 | Action | **ROAH** * PLACED IN FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.