Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Juarez, Roberto, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joseph Kaufman & Associates, Inc., against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, General Motors, Llc, represented by The Erskine Law Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet M Frangie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 24, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 25, 2021Answer Filed
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 23, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 18, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: December 01, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.