Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fasquez, Eduardo David filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Julia Campins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia Campins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY JAZMIN MADRIGAL - Minutes | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON REQUEST FOR RESTRAINING ORDERS RE: CIVIL HARASSMENT, FILED BY JAZMIN MADRIGAL - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING FILED ***TRO EFFECTIVE THRU 11/03/20*** Not Applicable |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
5CHARR CALENDARED ON 10/13/20 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/13/20 IN DEPT. 275. Not Applicable Judge: Julia Campins |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE ($35.00 FEE WAIVED) RE CHTRO FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
(CIVIL HARASSMENT) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL HARASSMENT RO REQUEST FILED 09/22/2020 OF JAZMIN MADRIGAL AS TO EDUARDO DAVID FASQUEZ JR, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/24/20 Not Applicable |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | --> CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/MSN201385 TO CIV/MSN20-1385. | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER SCHEDULED FOR 10/13/20 AT 8:30, IN DEPT. %%X% | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
CIVIL HARASSMENT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY JAZMIN MADRIGAL Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.