Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Amber Michelle Hertstein, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time255 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RENEWAL OF OSC/TRO SET BY JUDGE MINNEY (DEPT. 194) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
5SS CALENDARED ON 05/22/14 IN DEPT. 194. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 05/22/14 IN DEPT. 02. Not Applicable |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY AMBER MICHELLE HERTSTEIN VACATED |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY AMBER MICHELLE HERTSTEIN - Minutes GRANTED |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER AFTER HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING HARASSMENT FILED; PROTECTED PERSON: AMBER MICHELLE HERTSTEIN/ ORDER EXPIRES: 05/22/14 Not Applicable |
|
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC/TRO CIVIL HARASSMENT WAS SET FOR 11/21/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 194 | |
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING (11/21/13 AT 8:30 AM IN D-194) FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES Not Applicable |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
5CHARM CALENDARED ON 12/30/13 IN DEPT. 29. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 12/30/13 IN DEPT. 194. Not Applicable |
|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC/TRO RE: HARASSMENT (CIVIL) FILED BY AMBER MICHELLE HERTSTEIN - Minutes Complete |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF GLORIA J BILLICK FILED RE: MERI BRUNO AND HER DAUGHTER Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.