Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, A Utah, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael, Lina M, against Toni Mallicoat, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Steven K. Austin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven K. Austin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management177 days |
Filing DateMay 01, 2013 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions229 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time229 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 7/14/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33 | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OSC ISSUED |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT STRIKE ANSWER & ENTER DEF AULT FOR DEFTS FAILURE TO APPEAR 10/25/13 VACATED |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 05/01/2013 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH FILED Not Applicable |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FEE RECEIVED FOR STIP FROM AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.