Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kress, Elliott, Martin, Jaime, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wiener, Seth W, against Frey, James F., represented by Wickersham, James B., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Barry Baskin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry Baskin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2021 |
CategoryContract/Breach Of Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ADR CASE MANAGEMENT STIPULATION & ORDER FILED TO C ONT. 3/23/22 CMC TO 7/21/22 Not Applicable |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONFORMED COPY OF 2/28/22 CMC STIPO MAILED TO ATTY WIENER Not Applicable |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
FEE RECEIVED FOR STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ADR CASE MANAGEMENT BY JAMES F. FREY Not Applicable |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE VACATED |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT ON JAMES WICKERSHAM FILED; SERVED ON 12/07/21 Not Applicable |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
(U.J.) ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/02/2021 OF JAMES FREY FILED BY JAIME MARTIN Not Applicable |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
(U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/04/2021 OF ELLIOTT KRESS FILED BY JAMES F. FREY Not Applicable |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
(U.J.) CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JAMES F. FREY Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.