Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Debbie Oseguera, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Goldman, Ronald P., against Nation'S Foodservice Inc, represented by Mcclellan, Esq., Brian R., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Jill C. Fannin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJill C. Fannin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management154 days |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategoryOther-Non/Pi/Pd/Wd-Tort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions752 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1472 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 33 TO 36. Not Applicable |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 21 TO 33. Not Applicable |
|
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 31 TO 21. Not Applicable |
|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 6 DAY(S) VACATED |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 7/07/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 33 | |
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY DEBBIE OSEGUERA Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.