Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Isas, Juan, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Capstone Law Apc, against Ritmo Latino Wireless Llc A New Jersey Limited Liability Company, T-Mobile Usa Inc, A Delaware Corporation, represented by De Castro Law Group, P.C., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCohn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management88 days |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions159 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Reply Filed
Date: September 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 14, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: January 03, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: January 02, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: July 07, 2020Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: June 20, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Tentative decisions
Date: November 01, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 09, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: January 03, 2020Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: March 28, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 13, 2021Reply Filed
Date: June 03, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 02, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 13, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Tentative decisions
Date: June 09, 2022Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 07, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 02, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative decisions Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
November 01, 2022 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Reply in support of defendant Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC's renewed motion to compel individual arbitration. |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Juan Isas in support of plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to compel arbitration. |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's renewed motion to compel individual arbitration |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed In support of opposition to defendants motion to compel arbitration. |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Helga Hakimi in support of plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion to compel arbitration. |
|
August 09, 2022 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.