Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Calobrace, James Bret, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Lynn M. Poncin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time41 days |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 28, 2018Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: December 28, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Proof of Publication re:
Date: February 06, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 07, 2019Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: February 07, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: February 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment CLERK'S CALENDAR: FEES DUE OF $75.00 FOR JAMES BRET CALOBRACE | |
March 18, 2019 | Hearing | Clerks Calendar Re: Original Type Clerks Calendar Re: Hearing Time 8:30 AM Comment CLERK'S CALENDAR: FEES DUE OF $75.00 FOR JAMES BRET CALOBRACE | |
March 18, 2019 | |||
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CLERK'S CALENDAR: FEES DUE OF $75.00 FOR JAMES BRET CALOBRACE |
|
February 15, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment CLERK'S CALENDAR: FEES DUE OF $75.00 FOR JAMES BRET CALOBRACE | |
February 15, 2019 | Hearing | Clerks Calendar Re: Original Type Clerks Calendar Re: Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment CLERK'S CALENDAR: FEES DUE OF $75.00 FOR JAMES BRET CALOBRACE | |
February 15, 2019 | |||
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CLERK'S CALENDAR: FEES DUE OF $75.00 FOR JAMES BRET CALOBRACE |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED. |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name filed. DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM JAMES BRET CALOBRACE TO JAMES BRET ALVAREZ FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.