Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A As Successor In Interest To The Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mccarthy & Holthus, Llp, against Johnson, Scott, Tenorio, Nancy, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Khymberli S.Y. Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S.Y. Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 02, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 01, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: February 14, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 18, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 18, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 01, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 03, 2019At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 07, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 25, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 16, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: October 03, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 06, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 16, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 25, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 25, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: June 25, 2018Notice Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 20, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.