Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Navarro, Jose L., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Alvarado, Kathleen Gayle, against Bank Of America, Na, As Successor By Interest To Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Countrywide Home Loans Inc, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, The Bank Of New York Mellon, represented by Bryan Cave Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S. McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S. McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions224 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time1092 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 12, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 12, 2013Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 12, 2013Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: June 14, 2013Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: June 14, 2013At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 16, 2015Declaration re:
Date: July 29, 2014At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 09, 2014Motion Filed
Date: July 29, 2014At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: September 08, 2014Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 09, 2015Legacy Minutes
Date: September 25, 2014Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: June 08, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: July 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE L. NAVARRO FOR FAX FEE 160614-0743-VS FAX/ 3.00 PAYMT | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0260831007 | |
June 09, 2016 | |||
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S30 FOR 06/09 HRG |
|
May 10, 2016 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA COURT REPORTER MARY ANDERSON;10319 COURT ATTENDANT L CARMEN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DANIEL SHAHIDAZDEH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. REASON: CASE HAS SETTLED - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/09/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S30 FOR 05/10 HRG |
|
March 08, 2016 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.