Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Liddelow, Shane, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nott, Ross R, against Beach, Sarah Lynn, Beach, Sylvia, represented by Molinelli, James P, Jr, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven L. Dylina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management116 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial343 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time220 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Shane Liddelow, against the defendants Sarah Lynn Beach, Sylvia Beach, and Does 1 to 25. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction of the ca...
Case Management Statement
Date: February 24, 2015Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 27, 2015Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: August 06, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: March 30, 2015Complaint
Date: December 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Dept: 21 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHANE LIDDELOW. Notice N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHANE LIDDELOW. |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action *620*: HMSC CALENDARED ON 11/12/15 IN DEPT. 7. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 11/12/15 IN DEPT. 21. |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 11 - |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MCSJT2: MASTER CALENDAR TO SET PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT JURY TRIAL FOR DECEMBER 7, 2015. |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM: THERE IS NO ADR ORDERED IN THIS MATTER. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.