Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sadakian, Avo A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zoucha, Joseph R., against Singh, Vinit Nirmal, Ur Cab Service, represented by Bacerdo, Ray Z, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan I. Etezadi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan I. Etezadi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management115 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial609 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time786 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by AVO A SADAKIAN against VINITNIRMALSINGH and UR CAB SERVICE. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction of the case is unlimited civil, and the amount demand...
Case Management Statement
Date: November 13, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: August 11, 2015Request For Dismissal
Date: February 22, 2017Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: August 08, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: July 28, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: July 27, 2016Complaint
Date: December 29, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: July 19, 2016Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 07, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL 5 DAYS
Judge: Etezadi, Susan I. |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER FILED 05/10/16 |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 4 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 4 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER FILED 05/10/16 |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.