Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mah, Hoover, Zambrano-Mah, Wendy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Barquera, Miguel O. M., against Pavloff, Lance N, Scott, Kim A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Steven L. Dylina presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management118 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time235 days |
Complaint
Date: December 26, 2014Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: August 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action *620*: HCMC1I CALENDARED ON 08/21/15 IN DEPT. 21. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/21/15 IN DEPT. 7. |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action *620*: HCMC1I CALENDARED ON 08/21/15 IN DEPT. 7. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/21/15 IN DEPT. 21. |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CCN: CLERK`S OFFICE TO SEND NOTICE. |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COM1: - 7 - |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PDUCMS: PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SHALL SUBMIT AN UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MICMS: ENTERED BY C LYSSAND ON 04/23/15. |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/21/15 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 7. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.