Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gallaher Investments, Llc, Strands For Hair, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kelly, Richard M, against Strands For Hair, Inc, represented by Witte, Randall J, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Beth Labson Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management140 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2012 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial292 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time349 days |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Gallaher Investments, LLC against Defendant Strands for Hair, Inc. and Does 1 to 25. Plaintiff alleges that it is a California limited liability company and was the owner of certain commercial real property locate...
Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 25, 2012Conversion Action
Date: August 28, 2012Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 04, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: November 21, 2012Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 28, 2012Conversion Action
Date: August 28, 2012Complaint
Date: July 18, 2012Motion
Date: February 25, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: November 21, 2012Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 25, 2013Document
Date: May 07, 2013Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: August 21, 2013Document
Date: July 02, 2013Document
Date: July 02, 2013Conversion Action
Date: July 02, 2013Order
Date: March 26, 2013Conversion Action
Date: May 02, 2013Declaration
Date: February 25, 2013Document
Date: May 01, 2013Document
Date: May 01, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF GALLAHER INVESTMENTS, LLC FILED Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF GALLAHER INVESTMENTS, LLC FILED |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. DATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES 07/09/13. Conversion Action NOEJ: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. DATE OF MAILING TO ALL PARTIES 07/09/13. |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
2ND JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL WITHDRAWN BY JUDGE B. FREEMAN, FILED. Document FILED: 2ND JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL WITHDRAWN BY JUDGE B. FREEMAN, FILED. |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL WITHDRAWN BY JUDGE BETH FREEMAN, FILED. Document FILED: JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL WITHDRAWN BY JUDGE BETH FREEMAN, FILED. |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER TRIAL FILED AND ENTERED AS FOLLOWS: Conversion Action JCAT: JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER TRIAL FILED AND ENTERED AS FOLLOWS: |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: CROSS COMPLAINANT TAKE NOTHING BY REASON OF THE CROSS-COMPLAINT IN AFFIRMATIVE MONETARY |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute FFT: RECOVERY, SAVE AND ACCEPT AN "OFFSET" AS PLEAD BY DEFENDANT. |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JFD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF STRANDS FOR HAIR, INC FOR GALLAHER INVESTMENTS, LLC |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JAGP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF STRANDS FOR HAIR, INC AGAINST STRANDS FOR HAIR, INC |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $17,907.28 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.