Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Thompson, Welch, Soroko & Gilbert Llp, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Russell Frank Rowen, against Cameron Razavi, represented by John Gary Warner, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2019 | Action | NOTICE OF HEARING MAILED | |
December 27, 2019 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 02/28/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D19 | |
December 27, 2019 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 01/16/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: D19 DROP REASON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED | |
December 24, 2019 | Action | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED | |
November 08, 2019 | Action | IT IS ORDERED: ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR ROBERT A. MURRAY. SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. CHOU. PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL ATTACHED. DATE OF MAILING 11/08/2019. | |
September 24, 2019 | Hearing |
MINUTE ORDER POSTED - Appearance: 09/24/2019 at 9:00AM for CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES CHOU |
|
July 03, 2019 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 08/15/2019 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D19 DROP REASON: ANSWER FILED | |
July 03, 2019 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: DEFT, CAMERON RAZAVI - 435.00 | |
July 03, 2019 | Action | ANSWER DEFT, CAMERON RAZAVI | |
May 13, 2019 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 07/16/2019 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D19 DROP REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.