Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
George M Zigenis, filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 1995 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2004 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
March 08, 2004 | Action | CASE RE-OPENED / ACTIVE | |
September 01, 1995 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
September 01, 1995 | Action | CASE DISPOSED BEFORE TRIAL - OTHER JUDGMENTS DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED. NAME OF DYLAN MANOLIS HETHERTON-ZIGENIS CHANGED TO DYLAN MANOLIS-HETHERTON ZIGENIS. | |
July 21, 1995 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 09/01/1995 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: DFCV IN DEPARTMENT: 06 | |
July 20, 1995 | Action | PETITION FILED FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR) | |
July 20, 1995 | Action | CASE OPEN / ACTIVE STATUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.