Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Betchart, Denise, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Nielson, Johnnie Ray, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 1999 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 1999 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Entire Action W/PREJ FILED | |
July 01, 1999 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference 09/07/1999 03:45 PM D-510 | |
May 10, 1999 | Docket Event | Initial Filing Form Filed | |
April 21, 1999 | Docket Event | Complaint - Auto Tort Filed | |
April 21, 1999 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.