Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bazely, Elina F, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bazely, Gordon E, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 1989 |
CategoryDiss. Of Marriage - Female |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 1991 | Docket Event | Stat: (STATISTICAL INFORMATION ONLY - DISPOSITION RE: INITIAL CAUSE OF ACTION) | |
March 22, 1991 | Docket Event | Judgment Dissolution Filed | |
February 08, 1991 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulation and Waiver Filed | |
January 08, 1991 | Docket Event | Action Settled. Dropped From Calendar . TD VACATED | |
January 04, 1991 | Docket Event | Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 35 date: 01/04/1991 time: 01:30 PM | |
October 19, 1990 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney FILED AS TO RESP | |
September 25, 1990 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial FILED | |
September 25, 1990 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Conference Filed | |
September 25, 1990 | Docket Event | Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 01/04/1991 01:30 PM D-35 | |
September 25, 1990 | Docket Event | Civil Court Trial 01/08/1991 01:30 PM D-35 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.