Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Does 1 To 10 Inclusive, Gaiblerocon, Roger, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 27, 2019 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions157 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
This complaint is filed by Cavalry SPV, LLC against Roger Gaiblerocon, also known as Roger B Gaiblerocon. The court case number is CGC19578688. The complaint includes a proof of service, stating that the documents were served to Roger Gaiblerocon at ...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - DISMISSAL ON FILE | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200006487) | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200003362), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK SERVED NOV-21-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GAIBLEROCON, ROGER AKA ROGER B GAIBLEROCON | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT ROGER GAIBLEROCON ADK ROGER B GAIBLEROCON (TRANSACTION ID # 200000557) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FKA GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK AS TO DEFENDANT GAIBLEROCON, ROGER AKA ROGER B GAIBLEROCON DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-24-2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.