Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Sagonowsky, Christina M, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Pro Per, Romeo, Mark Joseph, Tour-Sarkissian, Christine, Vallone, Paul E, White, Bradley Ralph, (total of 5) See All against Adams, Grant, Adams, Grant O, American Business Appraisers Llp An Entity, Carroll, Michael Brooks, Does 1 Through 50 Inclusive, (total of 7) See All represented by Feeney, John Hoppock, Martini, Alan Louis, O'Leary, Timothy Francis, Romeo, Mark Joseph, Tasto, Donald L, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Charlene P. Kiesselbach presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharlene P. Kiesselbach Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2007 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1987 days |
This text does not appear to be a complaint in a legal case. It seems to be a document related to a court order. There is no specific information or details provided in the text that would allow for a summary or identification of any dollar amounts.
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 30, 2007ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS, GRANT
Date: August 14, 2007ORDER TAKING DEFENDANT MICHAEL BROOKS CARROLL'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT
Date: September 27, 2007ORDER OVERRULING TO DEMURRERS BY ROBERT LAVERSIN AND AMERICAN BUSINESS APPRAISERS
Date: October 02, 2007ORDER RE DEFENDANT CURTIS KEKOA JR'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: October 26, 2007ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KEKOA, CURTIS JR
Date: January 25, 2008ORDER OVERRULING TO DEMURRER OF CURTIS KEKOA, JR.
Date: January 24, 2008MINUTES FOR AUG-16-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 16, 2010MINUTES FOR AUG-17-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 17, 2010MINUTES FOR AUG-19-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 19, 2010STATEMENT OF DECISION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION
Date: October 07, 2010MINUTES FOR NOV-19-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: November 19, 2010MINUTES FOR JAN-10-2011 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: January 10, 2011ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: January 10, 2011MINUTES FOR MAY-19-2011 4:15 PM FOR DEPT 602
Date: May 19, 2011MINUTES FOR SEP-01-2011 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 602
Date: September 01, 2011ORDER ON DEFENDANT CURTIS KEKOA, JR.'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION
Date: September 21, 2011DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT KEKOA, CURTIS JR
Date: January 10, 2012NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: January 13, 2009SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JAN-14-2009 CONTINUED TO JAN-28-2009 AT 2:30 PM IN 602. (LAF)
Date: January 13, 2009MINUTES FOR MAR-09-2012 8:45 AM FOR DEPT 604
Date: March 09, 2012MINUTES FOR JUN-29-2012 1:30 PM
Date: July 02, 2012MATTER ON CALENDAR IN ERROR, DATE IS VACATED
Date: November 06, 2012ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET TRIAL DATE AND REOPEN DISCOVERY
Date: June 15, 2009MINUTES FOR JUL-22-2009 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 602
Date: July 22, 2009ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY STAY (A125559, DIV. 4)
Date: July 27, 2009ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ADAMS, GRANT
Date: February 11, 2008NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: March 25, 2008ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CURTIS KEKOA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: November 09, 2009NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: April 16, 2008MINUTES FOR NOV-12-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 504
Date: November 12, 2009MINUTES FOR JUL-27-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: July 26, 2010NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL SENT BY COURT. (206)
Date: December 24, 2009MINUTES FOR AUG-04-2010 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 04, 2010MINUTES FOR AUG-02-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 02, 2010DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT ADAMS, GRANT O
Date: July 21, 2008ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: July 29, 2008REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A121114, DIV. 4)
Date: September 17, 2008ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: December 23, 2008MINUTES FOR AUG-09-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 10, 2010MINUTES FOR AUG-10-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 602
Date: August 10, 2010ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ISSUE AND MONETARY SANCTIONS (NO COPY PROVIDED)
Date: August 03, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2012 | Hearing | Notice Of Motion & Motion To Amend Judgment | |
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event | MATTER ON CALENDAR IN ERROR, DATE IS VACATED | |
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR JUN-29-2012 1:30 PM | |
June 29, 2012 | Hearing |
(Renewed) Notice Of Motion Andm Motion To Compel Acknowledgement Of Satisfaction Of Judgment
Judge: CHARLENE P. KIESSELBACH |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON JUN-29-2012 IN DEPT. 19, (RENEWED) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT HEARD AND SUBMITTED ON JUNE 29, 2012 BY JUDGE CHARLENE P. KIESSELBACH. | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACITON OF JUDGMENT | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON JUN-29-2012 IN DEPT. 19, (RENEWED) NOTICE OF MOTION ANDM MOTION TO COMPEL ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT GRANTED, PURSUANT TO WRITTEN ORDER. | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT HEARING SET FOR NOV-14-2012 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 19 | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | (RENEWED) NOTICE OF MOTION ANDM MOTION TO COMPEL ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (CONTINUED FROM 12/14/09 DUE TO UNAVAILABILITY OF COURTROOM. PARTIES COULD NOT STIPULATE TO A DATE.) FILED BY DEFENDANT KEKOA, CURTIS JR HEARING SET FOR JUN-29-2012 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 19 | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION R1609702J008 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.