Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2001 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2003 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion To Transfer Venue DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO., Motion To Transfer Venue ..DENY-(302/D.MITCHELL/PB)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
June 24, 2003 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT MARVIN SLAVID, ALLSTATE INS. CO., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING REQUIRED.(302/REQ/AA)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
June 16, 2003 | Tentative Ruling |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT MARVIN SLAVID, ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONTINUE TO JUNE 24, 2003 ON COURT'S OWN MOTION.(302/PA)
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
June 06, 2003 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion To Bifurcate Trial Of Punitive Damages Claim GRANT, NO OPPOSITION FILED. (302/REQ/ju)
Judge: LORETTA M. NORRIS |
|
May 30, 2003 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion For Protective Order Precluding The Depositin Of Pltfs' Attorney Charles M. Miller PLAINTIFF BLAIR, EMILIA C, Motion For Protective Order Precluding The DepositiOn Of Pltfs' Attorney Charles M....
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
May 06, 2003 | Tentative Ruling |
Amended Notice Of Hearing On Allstate'S Petition And Motion To Correct Appraisal Award DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO. Amended Notice Of Hearing On Allstate'S Petition And Motion To Correct Appraisal...
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
April 28, 2003 | Tentative Ruling |
Amended Notice Of Hearing On Allstate'S Petition And Motion To Correct Appraisal Award DEFENDANT ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO., Amended Notice Of Hearing On Allstate'S Petition And Motion To Correct Appraisa...
Judge: RONALD E. QUIDACHAY |
|
May 30, 2002 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Request For Determiantion Of Appraisal Issues PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF APPRAISAL ISSUES - GRANT, APPRAISERS TO DETERMINE ACTUAL CASH VALUE OR AMOUNT OF L...
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
February 05, 2002 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Petition For Appointment Of An Umpire For Appraisal DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPOINT NEW UMPIRE DENIED - UMPIRE CORRECTLY APPOINTED PURSUANT TO INSURANCE CODE SECTION 2071 NO AUTHORITY TO APPOI...
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
|
November 30, 2001 | Tentative Ruling |
Ntc Of Mtn Of Deft Allstate Ins Co To Stay And/Or Compel Appraisal, Calendar Motion: Stay Proceedings, Calendar Motion: Compel MOTION FOR APPRAISAL GRANTED. COURT ORDERS APPRAISAL TO BE FULLY CONCLUDE...
Judge: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.