Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ochoa, Sylvia, County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Ochoa, Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 1999 |
CategoryRegistration Of California Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2000 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 3 date: 03/24/2000 time: 09:00 AM | |
March 24, 2000 | Docket Event | Minutes: MOTION FOR ORDER TO REQUIRE OBLIGOR TO SEEK WORK - TRSF'D TO D-24 | |
October 01, 1999 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 3 date: 10/01/1999 time: 09:00 AM | |
September 20, 1999 | Docket Event | Motion FOR ORDER TO REQUIRE OBLIGOR TO SEEK WORK IN ORDER TO PAY CURRENT CS ORDER FILED | |
September 20, 1999 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 03/24/2000 09:00 AM D-3 | |
March 29, 1999 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 10/01/1999 09:00 AM D-3 | |
March 29, 1999 | Docket Event | Motion BY DA FOR ORDER TO REQUIRE OBLIGOR TO SEEK WORK IN ORDER TO PAY CURRENT CS ORDER FILED | |
September 20, 1995 | Docket Event | Order for Assignment of Wages CHILD SUPPORT, FILED | |
September 20, 1995 | Docket Event | Application AND ORDER FOR HEALTH INSURANCE COVERAGE, FILED | |
August 07, 1993 | Docket Event | Stat: (STATISTICAL INFORMATION ONLY - ADDED TO REPORTING INVENTORY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.