Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Castillo Refugia, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Petros Lee J. Esq., against Davidson Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Kenji Machida presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 01, 2012 |
CategoryCivil Harassment (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court-Petition Denied |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 44, Kenji Machida, Presiding Motion for Attorney Fees - Granted Judge: Kenji Machida |
|
December 06, 2012 | Hearing |
Declaration (OF LEE PETROS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 06, 2012 | Hearing |
Objection Document (EVIDENTIARY-TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 30, 2012 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 21, 2012 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 20, 2012 | Hearing |
Opposition Document (TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 19, 2012 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR LEGAL FEES AND COSTS FROM PETITIONER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 08, 2012 | Hearing |
Order (AFTER HEARING DENYING CIVIL HARASSMENT ) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 44, Kenji Machida, Presiding Hrng on Petn Prohibit Harassment - Petition Denied Judge: Kenji Machida |
|
November 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.