Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Paul Rauber, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lenora Moore, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: June 01, 2005Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: August 11, 2005Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: April 04, 2006Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed
Date: April 04, 2006Application Re: Consolidate Cases Filed for Paul Rauber
Date: May 05, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 04, 2006Declaration of Grace Neufeld to correct testimony Filed
Date: April 12, 2006Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed
Date: July 06, 2006OEX - Bench Warrant ordered for $250
Date: July 06, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: July 06, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: September 07, 2005Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 13, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: October 13, 2005Assignment of Judgment Filed
Date: May 09, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: November 03, 2005Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: November 18, 2005Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: January 11, 2006Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: April 04, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: April 04, 2006Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 09, 2006Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 07/20/2006 11:00 AM D- 201
Date: July 07, 2006Order of Examination Issued
Date: May 26, 2006OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing
Date: July 20, 2006Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed
Date: July 06, 2006Miscellaneous :Receipt for Withdrawal of Exhibits at End of Trial Filed
Date: July 06, 2006For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.