Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jacqueline Palafox, Palafox, Jacqueline, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Matthew Palafox, Palafox, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Bittleston, Dawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBittleston, Dawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 03, 2021Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: November 05, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs T/E: 2 HRS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
October 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference SET 5/30/23 TRIAL: 11/08/23 1:30 PM Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
August 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference SET 5/30/23 TRIAL: 11/08/23 1:30 PM CSC: 10/24/23 8:30 AM Judge: Schuett, Stephen D. |
|
August 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 1/28/21 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 4/7/21, 5/19/21, 8/19/21, 11/10/21, 2/3/22,02/09/22, 6/22/22, 7/18/22 11/03/22 1/19/23 3/30/23 4/04/23 5/26/23 5/30/23 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
June 01, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Trial |
|
May 30, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
May 30, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
May 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Family Centered Case Resolution 4/27/23 NOTICE OF FCCR HEARING 2 MINORS Judge: Bittleston, Dawn |
|
May 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 1/28/21 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 4/7/21, 5/19/21, 8/19/21, 11/10/21, 2/3/22,02/09/22, 6/22/22, 7/18/22 11/03/22 1/19/23 3/30/23 4/04/23 5/26/23 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
May 26, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 1/28/21 DCSS NOM MOD CS HC STND ORDS INTERVENE 2 MINORS CONTD FROM 4/7/21, 5/19/21, 8/19/21, 11/10/21, 2/3/22,02/09/22, 6/22/22, 7/18/22 11/03/22 1/19/23 3/30/23 4/04/23 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.