Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mullen John Rodney, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Kaplan Janet, against Mullen Traci, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Robert B. Axel presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 10, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions529 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time570 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (of David K. Yamamoto, ESQ; - On Behalf of: Respondent: Mullen, Traci ) Filed by Respondent |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mullen, John - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mullen, John - Filed and Entered on 2014-12-01 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mullen, John ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (or Uncontested - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mullen, John - Filed and Entered on 2014-11-25 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 10-23-14 ) | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received After Hearing (rec'd 10-24-14 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mullen, John ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Mullen, Traci ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (advance further atty's fees & acct's fees - Filed and Entered on 2014-09-16 ) | |
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mullen, John ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.