Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dickinson, Sherrie, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Alwill, Julian, against Ray, Sara Luis, Sara Louise Ray, Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Suzann Brown Aka Suzann K. Zook Brown Aka Suzann Kent Brown Aka Suzann Zook Brown Aka Suzann K. Brown Aka Suzann Z Brown, The Estate Of Suzann Brown Aka Suzann K. Zook Brown Aka Suzann Kent Brown Aka Suzann Zook Brown Aka Suzann K. Brown Aka Suzann Z Brown, A California Estate, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 18, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 20226 - POS of Summons Sara Louise Ray as Rep of Estate
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal (00541788xDA2F4)
Date: April 04, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal (00541788xDA2F4) | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 6 - POS of Summons Sara Louise Ray as Rep of Estate | |
November 08, 2021 | Hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/18/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H |
|
November 05, 2021 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
November 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/18/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: H |
|
November 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice TO: Attorney, Julian Alwill RE: Civil Case Cover Sheet REASON: document incomplete |
|
November 05, 2021 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.