Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Orozco, Gabriel, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Akhavan, Bardia Aaron, against Kern Ridge Growers, Llc, Rangel, Raul, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Order to Show Cause
Date: November 05, 2021Decl of Mathew Brady ISO Demurrer Motion to Strike (00516754xDA2F4)
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Demurrer Demurrer (00516761xDA2F4)
Date: January 19, 2022Memo of Ps As ISO Demurrer (00516767xDA2F4)
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Motion Motion to Strike (00516759xDA2F4)
Date: January 19, 2022Memo of Ps As ISO Motion to Strike (00516766xDA2F4)
Date: January 19, 2022Orozco FAC
Date: February 03, 2022V2 Orozco FAC-compressed
Date: February 04, 2022Court letter re 2-17 hearings (00525205xDA2F4)
Date: February 14, 2022Answer to First Amended Complaint (00531493xDA2F4)
Date: March 08, 2022CMC Statement (1)
Date: April 22, 2022POS Re Jury Fees and CMC
Date: April 22, 2022Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: April 22, 2022V2Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: April 28, 2022POS Re Jury Fees and CMC
Date: April 28, 2022V2 Updated CMC Statement
Date: April 28, 2022Notice of Posting Jury Fees (00549019xDA2F4)
Date: April 28, 2022Case Management Statement (CMC 5-4-22) (00549018xDA2F4)
Date: April 28, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -OROZCO (FULLY EXECUTED)
Date: June 17, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - R. RANGEL
Date: June 30, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL FOR ARBITRATION
Date: September 07, 2022Stip to Continue MTC
Date: September 21, 2022Re-Notice of Petition to Compel Arbitration
Date: October 04, 2022RFD 12-22-2022
Date: December 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | RFD 12-22-2022 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NTC OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | LTR TO VACATE MTC | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Petition to Compel Arbitration | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Stip to Continue MTC | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL FOR ARBITRATION | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - R. RANGEL | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -OROZCO (FULLY EXECUTED) | |
May 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | V2Notice of Posting Jury Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.