Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Topete, Jesus Figueroa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mann, Matthew L., against Remedial Transportation Services, Inc., A California Corporation, Wills, Joshua David, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2021 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Topete Request for Dismissal
Date: February 08, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2022Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: April 10, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 04, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 05, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: February 20, 2024Ruling
Date: February 04, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: November 05, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 17, 2021Ruling
Date: January 18, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: June 03, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 18, 202253958Notic01aaf0
Date: February 25, 202253958Answe0075ac
Date: February 25, 2022Topete Notice of posting jury fees
Date: March 07, 202256907CaseM00984b
Date: April 28, 2022Topete May 4 2022 CMC Statement
Date: April 29, 2022Topete Proposed Order Stip.docx
Date: July 01, 2022ANH8025-Proposed Stip to Consolidate
Date: July 01, 2022Topete Request for Default Remedial
Date: January 28, 2022AYQ9221-Stip Order to Continue Trial Ryan
Date: January 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E 7 DAYS |
|
March 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 7 DAYS Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/18/2024 Mandatory Settlement Conference DEPT 17. TRIAL/FCMC 3/18/24. T/E 7 DAYS -- cont'd from 2/16/24 |
|
February 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference DEPT 17. TRIAL/FCMC 3/18/24. T/E 7 DAYS -- cont'd from 2/16/24 Judge: Friedman - Retired, Gary T. |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Topete Request for Dismissal | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) as to lead case BCV-21-102577 only. With prejudice. |
|
February 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) as to lead case BCV-21-102577 only. With prejudice. |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/18/2024 Ruling |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) as to child case BCV-21-102648 only. With prejudice. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.