Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Rawlings, Richard, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by O'Hara, Kevin W., Sanchez, Gabriel Sepulveda, against California Department Of Transportation, City Of Bakersfield, City Of Bakersfield, A California Government Entity, County Of Bakersfield, A California Government Entity, Couny Of Kern, (total of 5) See All represented by Bruce, William A, Clavel, Nikolette Y, O'Dell, Michael L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: February 21, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: March 06, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: May 20, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 03, 2021Motion to Continue
Date: February 21, 2024Ruling
Date: March 06, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 15, 2023Trial Setting Conference
Date: March 29, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 03, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: August 13, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 18, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 13, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 24, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 25, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 09, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 04, 2021COB- Joinder
Date: March 11, 2024Motion to Bifurcate
Date: March 13, 2024Ruling
Date: April 19, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: November 29, 2021REPLY TO OPPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2024[Proposed] Order on Objections to Evidence
Date: February 29, 2024Reply to Pltf Addtl Undisputed Material Facts
Date: February 29, 2024Objections to Evidence
Date: February 29, 2024Reply to Opposition
Date: February 29, 20242292011_2024_02_29_Opp_t_ifurcate_declaration
Date: February 29, 2024CT's Evidence ISO Opposition to CoB's MSJ
Date: February 22, 2024CT's Opposition to CoB's MSJ
Date: February 22, 2024CT's Sep Stmt ISO Opposition to CoB's MSJ
Date: February 22, 20242288605_2024_02_20_separate_statement_2
Date: February 21, 20242288605_2024_02_20_oppos_xhibits_2_compressed
Date: February 21, 20242287990_motion_to_continue_trial
Date: February 20, 20242287990_ex_parte_to_cont_r_in_alternative_OST
Date: February 20, 2024Proposed Order Bifurcating Trial_FINAL
Date: February 13, 2024Caltrans' NOM to Bifurcate Trial_FINAL
Date: February 13, 2024COB - Answer to Complaint
Date: January 10, 202252348CaseM0071f3
Date: January 21, 2022COB - Ntc of Posting Jury Fees
Date: January 25, 2022CW425507
Date: January 24, 2022COB - CMC Stmt (2-9-22)
Date: January 25, 2022CMC Statement_Caltrans final
Date: January 26, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 12, 2022CW428879
Date: February 16, 202253803Count00bd76
Date: February 23, 202253803Count0184e7
Date: February 23, 202253803Decla02f86d
Date: February 23, 202253803Decla03f029
Date: February 23, 202254606PLAIN00314c
Date: March 10, 202254787Reque00136f
Date: March 15, 20222022.04.28 Caltrans' CMC Statement
Date: April 28, 202257244CaseM00eee8
Date: May 05, 2022COB - CMC Stmt (5-20-22)
Date: May 09, 2022CW426775
Date: February 01, 202261422Notic00925a
Date: August 04, 20222091635 - 2022.08.04 P Ntc of Association
Date: August 05, 202261562Notic005c97
Date: August 05, 2022COB - Notice of Change of Handling Atty
Date: November 30, 20222023.01.27 Stipulation to Continue Trial and Trial-Related Dates
Date: January 27, 202323.3.15 Caltrans CMC Statement re 03.29.23
Date: March 15, 20232023_03_15_p_cmc_statement_fixed
Date: March 15, 2023COB- CMC Stmt (3.29.23)
Date: March 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
October 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days |
|
October 14, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Trial/ FCMC 10/14/24, Dept 17, T/E 7 days |
|
September 11, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Trial/ FCMC 10/14/24, Dept 17, T/E 7 days Judge: Friedman - Retired, Gary T. |
|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference DEPT 17 TRIAL 4/15/24. T/E 7 DAYS |
|
March 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference DEPT 17 TRIAL 4/15/24. T/E 7 DAYS Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.