Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aguilar, Christina D., Aguilar, Gerardo A., Aguilar, Juan, Aguilar, Soraya, Aldaoud, Nancy, (total of 81) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Chodzko, Megan, against Lennar Fresno Inc. A California Corporation, Lennar Homes Of California, Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
Category10-Cv Construction Defect - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause
Date: June 14, 20216236 Aldaoud - RFD HOs
Date: January 20, 202253222CaseM01356f
Date: February 09, 202253222Notic00a7be
Date: February 09, 20226236 Aldaoud - CMC Statement for 3-3-22
Date: February 16, 2022CMS for 07.15.22
Date: June 23, 20226236 Aldaoud - RFD
Date: June 29, 20222636 Aldaoud - CM Stmt Due 6-30
Date: June 30, 2022Joint CMS for 12.08.23
Date: November 28, 2023Stip and Order Lifting Stay
Date: August 10, 20226236 Aldaoud - RFD for Sergio Ruiz
Date: August 18, 2022Answer to Plts' Complaint
Date: September 08, 20226236 Aldaoud - CM Statement - Due 9-28
Date: September 19, 202266075propo0079a3
Date: November 08, 20226236 Aldaoud - RFD
Date: December 28, 2022Aldaoud. Notice of Change of Address (00494206x9C748)
Date: March 02, 2023CMS for 4.12.23
Date: March 22, 2023Aldaoud. RFD for Balbas Benavides Camacho Gallego (00501988x9C748)
Date: June 23, 202379688CaseM001299
Date: July 27, 20236236 Aldaoud - RFD for Hughes
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference continued from 08/10/2023 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint CMS for 12.08.23 | |
November 28, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement Joint Case Management Statement |
|
October 26, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) as to Plaintiff Ronnreika Hughes only |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 6236 Aldaoud - RFD for Hughes | |
August 10, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Status Conference continued from 04/12/2023 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Status Conference continued from 04/12/2023 |
|
July 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement filed jointly |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 79688CaseM001299 | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement filed jointly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.