Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Mabry, J.O. Lewis, Mabry, Patricia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Johnson, Craig E, against Peters, Brittany Paige, Peters, Phillip, Pv Holding Corp, represented by Ash, Paul V, Liebman, Stuart J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause
Date: March 15, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: March 16, 2023Ruling
Date: January 13, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 09, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: May 18, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 17, 2023Case Status Conference
Date: April 05, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 28, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 13, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 27, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 27, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: November 12, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: November 12, 2021MABRY_NOTICE_OF_SETTLEMENT_OF_ENTIRE_CASE_
Date: April 18, 2024NTC 3
Date: March 15, 2024NTC 2
Date: March 15, 2024NTC 1
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER 3
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER 2
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER 1
Date: March 15, 2024MOTION 3
Date: March 15, 2024MOTION 2
Date: March 15, 2024MOTION 1
Date: March 15, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: September 13, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 28, 202120220404_CIV_100
Date: April 05, 2022DEMAND
Date: January 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 12, 2023StipulationtoSetAsideDefaultfullyexecuted
Date: January 26, 2023DemandforJuryTrial
Date: January 26, 2023AnswertoComplaintforPVHolding
Date: January 26, 2023DEMAND
Date: February 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 23, 202371522Deman017a37
Date: February 27, 202371522Notic023983
Date: February 27, 2023MABRY_JO_LIT_CF_CMC_NEWEST_VERSION
Date: March 14, 202372506Stipu001e21
Date: March 16, 202372576Stipu002e2e
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial Time estimate: 7 days Jury for Defendants Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Time estimate: 7 days Jury for Defendants |
|
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference Jury trial set on 06/17/2024 Time estimate 7 day Jury for Defendant |
|
June 14, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference Jury trial set on 06/17/2024 Time estimate 7 day Jury for Defendant Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 6/17/2024 in Div J, Time Estimate 7 Days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 6/17/2024 in Div J, Time Estimate 7 Days |
|
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion (Pre-Disposition) Filed 3/14/24 Defendant PV Holdings Corp Motion to have requests for admissions deemed admitted Set One |
|
May 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion (Pre-Disposition) Filed 3/14/24 Defendant PV Holdings Corp Motion to have requests for admissions deemed admitted Set One Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion to Compel Filed 3/14/24 Defendant PV Holdings Corp Motion to Compel Answer to Form Interrogatories Set One Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion to Compel Filed 3/14/24 Defendant PV Holdings Corp Motion to Compel Answer to Special Interrogatories Set One Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.