Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Entzminger, David Roy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Earl L. Henderson Trucking Company, Inc., Henderson, Earl L., Tienda, Tommy Kennedy, represented by Starinieri, Teresa M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 28, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: March 15, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: February 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Firm Name Change | |
January 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 11/16/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 11/16/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
November 16, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
November 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/13/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/13/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 28, 2021 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Cont'd from 6/28/21 per COP dated 6/25/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 13, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
September 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Cont'd from 6/28/21 per COP dated 6/25/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.