Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Salas, Mario Fernando, Jr., filed a(n) 02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited case represented by Middlebrook, Richard O, against Department Of Motor Vehicles, An Agency Of The State Of California, Buy And Through Its Director Steve Gordon, represented by Parr, Bradley, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management67 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
Category02-Cv Writ Of Mandate-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial191 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Court Trial
Judge: Palmer - Retired, William D. |
|
January 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Ruling
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
December 17, 2020 | Hearing | REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE | |
December 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Petitioner's Reply and Proof of Service |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Petitioner's Reply and Proof of Service |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE | |
December 10, 2020 | Hearing | Ruling | |
November 23, 2020 | Hearing | Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate | |
November 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Answer to Complaint Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandate; Affirmative Responses |
|
November 23, 2020 | Hearing | Administrative Record |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.