Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Zuberi, Nabeel M, against Jack Sherman, As Trustee Of The Sherman Family Trust Dated September 17, 1990 And Successor-In-Interest To That Certain Deed Of Trust Recorded For The Benefit Of Arnold Sherman, Linda Sherman-Nurick, As Trustee Of The Sherman Family Trust Dated September 17, 1990 And Successor-In-Interest To That Certain Deed Of Trust Recorded For The Benefit Of Arnold Sherman, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2017 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time230 days |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: April 05, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: May 24, 2018Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 08, 2018Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: May 24, 2018Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 11, 2018Order to Show Cause
Date: October 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 06/11/18 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 06/11/18 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 05/24/18 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 05/24/18 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 12, 2018 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) Request for Dismissal of Entire Action |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) Request for Dismissal of Entire Action |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/11/2018 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 4/5/18 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110 and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 4/5/18 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 05, 2018 | Hearing | Mail Returned Undelivered | |
June 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys Substitution of Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.