Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cornelio Charlie, Cornelio Hector, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Anyia Alfred Oshiomele, against Greenbough Ken, Patton Barbara, Walker Blake, Walker Kelley, Walker Martin J., (total of 5) See All represented by Eick William Eugene, Freeborn Joshua C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Brenda M. Penny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrenda M. Penny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management167 days |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2018 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: John Doe 1 (Defendant); Kelley Walker (Defendant); Martin J. Walker (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kelley Walker (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order re true names of defendants; Filed by:
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Charlie Cornelio (Plaintiff); Hector Cornelio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Charlie Cornelio (Plaintiff); Hector Cornelio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES A. BLACK
Date: September 11, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELLEY WALKER
Date: September 11, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 11, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM E. EICK
Date: September 11, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF BARBARA PATTON
Date: September 11, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEN GREENBOUGH
Date: September 11, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 11, 2019Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: September 16, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/09/2019
Date: October 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 09, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 02, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION RE: EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 02, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: December 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 13, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 21, 2022Answer; Filed by: Barbara Patton (Defendant); Ken Greenbough (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Charlie Cornelio (Plaintiff); Hector Cornelio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kelley Walker (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Charlie Cornelio (Plaintiff); Hector Cornelio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Blake Walker (Defendant); Kelley Walker (Defendant); Martin J. Walker (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: March 21, 2022Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Barbara Patton (Defendant); Ken Greenbough (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order on Notice of Related Cases Re: Cornelio, et al v....)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing) Filed by Kelley Walker (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing) Filed by Kelley Walker (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Charlie Cornelio (Plaintiff); Hector Cornelio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: ruling on...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by Kelley Walker (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (18STPB04206 Revocable Trust vs Hector Cornelio)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: ruling on...))
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Hearing)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order on Notice of Related Cases Re: Cornelio, et al v....))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/09/2019)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration (of William E. Eick)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Josephine S. Morey)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Ken Greenbough)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelley Walker)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/08/2019)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Declaration (of James A. Black)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Martin J. Walker)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Blake Walker)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Barbara Patton)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2020)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Status Conference))
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (Re: Evidence in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.