Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tavai Marylyn "Lyn", filed a(n) Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) case against Henry Billie, Jackson Charlece, Jackson Ellsworth, Jackson Keisha, Jackson Monye, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael C. Small presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2018 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: February 23, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: February 23, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
Date: March 02, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 05, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: March 05, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 13, 2018NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -
Date: April 05, 2018NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR RELATION.
Date: April 30, 2018Minute Order -
Date: June 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)
Date: August 01, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)
Date: September 12, 2018SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 15, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)
Date: February 21, 2019Minute Order ((Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Marylyn "Lyn" Tavai (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by null
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Marylyn "Lyn" Tavai (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by null
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Marylyn "Lyn" Tavai (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by null
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Minute Order: As To Parties: removed | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00: As To Parties: removed | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 33, col 29] with Document:43821331 | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 33, col 29] with Document:43821328 | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 33, col 29] with Document:43821326 | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: As To Parties: removed | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 33, col 29] with Document:43821329 | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv: As To Parties: removed | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 33, col 29] with Document:43821330 | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 33, col 29] with Document:43821327 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.